U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRAYSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 08, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • May 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • May 06, 2025: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Jury Selection - Do Not Use If Jurors Sworn/Trial Began]
  • May 06, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • April 28, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Supplement to any document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 20, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 18, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 18, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 17, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for 404(b) Evidence]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 04, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 31, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 14, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reply to Opposition]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • March 09, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2023: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • January 23, 2023: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2023: [Reconsideration ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 20, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 13, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2023: [Temporary Detention ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2023: [Unseal Case]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.