U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00018
  • Case Name: The Z Flats L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • January 22, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • January 21, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 21, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.