U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00137-12
  • Case Name: USA v. WRIGHT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: [Vacate (2255)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 19, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 13, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Warrant Quashed]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 02, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Warrant Quashed]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 30, 2024: [Continue ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 26, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.