U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00429-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VAGLICA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 06, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 06, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 01, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 01, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.