U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00292-4
  • Case Name: USA v. EVANS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 04, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 31, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 31, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 13, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2024: [.Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 26, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.