U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00073-21
  • Case Name: USA v. VALDEZ et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Interim Payment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence- USSC Amendment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reduce Sentence- USSC Amendment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appoint Expert ]
  • April 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Information - Felony]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 19, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 15, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 20, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 11, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 09, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 08, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Error]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Criminal History Report]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2024: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.