U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • September 27, 2024: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • September 27, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • September 26, 2024: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • September 26, 2024: [Trial Brief ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.