U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00433-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BAILEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Update Bond Information ]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [.Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.