U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00080-2
  • Case Name: USA v. RODRIGUEZ et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Supplement to any document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.