U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00123-3
  • Case Name: USA v. MARESCA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Supplement to any document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Receipt for Passport]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply in Support]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Supplement to any document]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone]
  • October 10, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 09, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2024: [Appear by Telephone]
  • October 09, 2024: [Modify]
  • October 09, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 07, 2024: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 04, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • September 26, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.