U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LICHTENSTEIN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply in Support]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • April 04, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Declaration]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 19, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2024
  • November 16, 2024: [Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Victim Rights ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Downward Departure]
  • October 09, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Victim Rights ]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [.Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.