U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STYNER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Information - Felony]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 26, 2024: [Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.