U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00202-5
  • Case Name: USA v. OLUGBENGA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Supplement to any document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 15, 2025: [Supplement to any document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order of Forfeiture]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 12, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue ]
December, 2024
  • December 03, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 04, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Extension of Time to]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.