U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00371-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOYNER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Reply to Opposition]
  • October 03, 2024: [Response to motion]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [In Limine ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Response to motion]
  • September 26, 2024: [Reply to Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.