U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAMOND
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 13, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue ]
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
September, 2024
  • September 29, 2024: [.Order]
  • September 29, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.