U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00426-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JAMES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 12, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 04, 2024: [Protective Order ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.