U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CUDO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2024: [Reply in Support]
  • October 03, 2024: [Response to motion]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 29, 2024: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.