U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00435-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply in Support]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 23, 2025: [Supplement to any document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 04, 2025: [Exclude]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 17, 2025: [Supplement to any document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [404(b) Evidence]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever Count(s)]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 11, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Disclosure ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Protective Order ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2024: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 03, 2024: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.