U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-ml-09999
  • Case Name: REDACTED SCA AND PRA DOCUMENTS PROMPTED BY MLAT PURSUANT TO STANDING ORDER NO. 22-05 (BAH)
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
December, 2024
  • December 14, 2024: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • December 13, 2024: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.