U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00050-
  • Case Name: Omni Excavators, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Ch. 11 Subch V Case Trustee's Report of NoDistribution B-case dism or conv, fee award recd]
October, 2024
  • October 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Notice - Generic]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Order To Show Cause]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
September, 2024
  • September 29, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.