U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00142-
  • Case Name: 4318 Halley Terrace SE LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Bond]
September, 2024
  • September 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Notice - Generic]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Joint Administration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.