U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00219-
  • Case Name: Olekanma Ekekwe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Unsecured Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Consent Order]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Proposed Order]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule I]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule E/F]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule D]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule C]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.