U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00191-
  • Case Name: 3208 GSD, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismiss Case]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Continued]
September, 2024
  • September 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.