U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10027-
  • Case Name: Froget v. Clements
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 11, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Disposition of Adversary]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reconsider]
December, 2024
  • December 21, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 18, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reconsider]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 26, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 26, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.