U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00232-
  • Case Name: Melben, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Continued (by Order)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Amend/Modify]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Operating Report]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Operating Report]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Operating Report]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Amended Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Continued (by Order)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Continue Hearing]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Authority to Obtain Credit Under 11 U.S.C. § 364]
  • November 13, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
October, 2024
  • October 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending creditor list or schedules A-J)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Authority to Obtain Credit]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Response]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing of Transcript]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Transcript]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Objection]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Complaint]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Objection]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.