U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00180-
  • Case Name: 1416 EASTERN AVE NE LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Transcript]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order - Generic]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Bond]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice - Generic]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Brief]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 11 Ballot Summary]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Objection]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Operating Report]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Compensation]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Objection]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice - Generic]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 11 Plan]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Operating Report]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Approve]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Use Cash Collateral]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Employ]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Employ]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Operating Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.