U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00326-
  • Case Name: Darrell L Moyers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.