U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EDELMAN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.