U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00139-3
  • Case Name: USA v. HORNE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Convert Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Exclude]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2024: [.Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 27, 2024: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.