U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00393-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MUCHIMBA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Verdict Form ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Jury Notes ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Jury Instructions ]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • March 13, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • March 11, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • March 10, 2025: [Jury Selection - Do Not Use If Jurors Sworn/Trial Began]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.