U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00065-
  • Case Name: Raocore Technology, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Reply]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Objection]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice - Generic]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Notice - Generic]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Transmittal of Record on Appeal]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Transmittal of Record on Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing of Transcript]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing of Transcript]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing of Transcript]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing of Transcript]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Transcript]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Transcript]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Transcript]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Transcript]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt re Notice of Appeal]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Receipt re Notice of Appeal]
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Compensation]
  • February 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Employ]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Notice - Generic]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Notice - Generic]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Continue Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Continue Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Response]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Response]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Order - Generic]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Order - Generic]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Order Striking Document]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Order Striking Document]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Notice - Generic]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Notice - Generic]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Objection]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Objection]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Reply]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Reply]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Response]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Response]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Response]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.