U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00303-
  • Case Name: Sherry Dawnette Ransom
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule J]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule I]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Exhibit]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Complaint]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Discharge Order to Show Cause (Judge)]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Ineligibility for Discharge]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Objecting to Discharge]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.