U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00250-
  • Case Name: Danielle Eleise Pennington
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Appellant Designation]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Transmittal of Record on Appeal]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Final Order by District Court re: Appeal]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt re Notice of Appeal]
November, 2024
  • November 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Stay Pending Appeal]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.