U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00262-
  • Case Name: JPK NewCo LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Order To Close Case - Ch 11 (Dismissed)]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Compensation]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Extend/Shorten Time]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Opposition]
  • October 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Notice - Generic]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Opposition]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Amended Order]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • October 05, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Employ]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.