U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00214-
  • Case Name: JJB D.C., Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Withdrawing or Substituting Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Operating Report]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Operating Report]
November, 2024
  • November 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Operating Report]
October, 2024
  • October 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Response]
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence A. [Notice - Generic]
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Notice - Generic]
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence A. [Examination]
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Examination]
  • October 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence A. [Operating Report]
  • October 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Operating Report]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence A. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Relief from Stay]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.