U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10019-
  • Case Name: Amiri v. Omni Excavators, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Held (AP)]
  • December 11, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Document]
  • December 08, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2024
  • October 20, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice - Generic]
  • October 07, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • October 07, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • October 02, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 01, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Pretrial Order]
  • September 30, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reconsider]
  • September 27, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Held (BK)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.