U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00316-
  • Case Name: Maryam Aliyah Farrakhan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.