U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00082-
  • Case Name: COMM 2013-CCRE12 K Street NW, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.