U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00138-
  • Case Name: 4001 First St SE LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Order - Generic]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Hearing - Held (BK)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Notice - Generic]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Employ]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Notice - Generic]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Employ]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Employ]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Notice - Generic]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Declaration]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Approve]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Declaration]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Employ]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 29, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Bond]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Notice - Generic]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, H. Jason [Joint Administration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.