U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00327
  • Case Name: Concepcion M. Campos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Dismiss Case]
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.