U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00223-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PERRY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 29, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear by Telephone]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [.Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.