U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10024-
  • Case Name: Tristar Solutions, LLC v. Wise Funding Group, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 09, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
  • October 02, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (AP)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • September 27, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.