U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00320-
  • Case Name: Ashura Kenji-Badru Goines, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Request to Withdraw Document]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing Continued]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Relief from Stay]
October, 2024
  • October 18, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Continue First Meeting of Creditors]
September, 2024
  • September 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.