U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00267-
  • Case Name: Theodore Roosevelt Moore, III
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Voluntarily Dismissing Case (withOUT Prejudice)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary or Stipulated Dismissal]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Continued]
  • October 22, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection]
  • October 16, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Opposition]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.