U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00339-
  • Case Name: The Avenue DC, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Order - Generic]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution F-non-consensual plan consummated, fees awarded]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Final Decree]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Compensation]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Order - Generic]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Held (BK)]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Opportunity to Object (Correction)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Operating Report]
  • January 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • January 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Operating Report]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Compensation]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Order - Generic]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under 11 U.S.C. § 363(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.