U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00111-
  • Case Name: Corey Barnette
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Confirming Subchapter V Plan]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Converting Case to 11]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Consent Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.