U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TURMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2025: [Convert Hearing]
  • April 27, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 27, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.