U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00157-
  • Case Name: Steven G McLendon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Application for Compensation]
  • April 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Exhibit]
  • April 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Request to Withdraw Document]
  • April 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Compensation]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
February, 2025
  • February 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Continued]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Unsecured Claim]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Opposition]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Failure to Prosecute]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order for Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Proposed Order]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.