U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00290-
  • Case Name: Alisha Ronnay Williams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.