U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10028-
  • Case Name: Jaris, Inc as servicer for Jaris Fund, LP as succe v. Melben, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • April 07, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (by Order)]
  • April 04, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons - Service Executed]
  • October 04, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 02, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 01, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 01, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.